Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Sponsored by
Delegates Feldmark, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Hill, Hornberger, Korman, Terrasa, and Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring an original equipment manufacturer to make available, on fair and reasonable terms, certain materials or updates to an independent repair provider or owner of digital electronic equipment; providing that a violation of certain provisions of the Act is an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice and subject to certain enforcement and penalty provisions; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0412
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2021
Legislative Date
1/14/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
House 1/14/2021 1/14/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301,   14-4301 through 14-4304 )
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 5:44 AM