Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Requirements and Records
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Anderson, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an automated purchasing machine to require a seller of specified personal property to provide specified information before the completion of a transaction; requiring an automated purchasing machine to verify specified information through specified documentation submitted by a seller; establishing specified record keeping and reporting requirements for an APM operator; requiring an APM operator to keep specified personal property in the State for a specified period of time; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
9/12/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 9/12/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-801 through 19-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM