Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB0086 - 2020RS
   CH0022 - 2021RS
Title
Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 22 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions of law related to the calculation of a certain budget increase for the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority; and altering the information that the Authority must submit to the Department of Transportation as part of its yearly performance and condition assessments and reports to include certain single audit reports issued in accordance with certain requirements.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0136
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1412 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864966/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Overridden (94-39)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 22 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {864966/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (96-41) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Second Reading Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (30-14) 53CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Overridden (94-39)
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Overridden (31-15)
House 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 22 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
(   10-205 )
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 10:34 AM
Click to return on the top page