Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole and Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for a maximum fine of $500 for a violation of certain prohibitions against using a handheld telephone while driving a motor vehicle; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0042 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (83-58)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (83-58) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1124.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM