Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing a Bicycle, an Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device, or a Motor Scooter - Distance Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering to 4 feet the distance that the driver of a motor vehicle is required to maintain, except under specified circumstances, when passing a bicycle, an electric personal assistive mobility device (EPAMD), or a motor scooter.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
9/24/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 9/24/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM