Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the manner in which an applicant for a handgun permit is required to pay a certain fee to allow for payment by electronic check, credit card, or a method of online payment approved by the Secretary of State Police.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0113
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {962215/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {718570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {962215/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {718570/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM