Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
Sponsored by
Delegate Henson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a county to establish a local youth violence review committee to prevent violence and homicides involving youth assailants and youth victims by promoting cooperation among certain agencies, providing youth services, determining the causes of youth violence, and recommending certain changes; specifying that certain officials may organize a local youth violence review committee; providing the committee with access to certain information; providing that certain records obtained by the committee are confidential; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0406
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-601 through 1-607 )
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 4:49 PM