Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Accidental Disability Retirement Application
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Attar, and Bridges
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to accept an application for an accidental disability retirement allowance from certain individuals within 3 years after the individuals' retirement; requiring that the accidental disability retirement allowance begin on a certain day under certain circumstances; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2020.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Accidental Disability Retirement Application
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM