Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich
Sponsored by
Delegate Cane
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating the soft-shell crab sandwich as the State sandwich.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0029
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0013 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/21/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/21/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/10/2014 1/10/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM