Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain dealer or other person from loaning a regulated firearm to a certain borrower under certain circumstances; prohibiting a certain dealer or other person from selling, renting, loaning, or transferring a regulated firearm to a certain person who the dealer or other person knows or has reason to believe intends to use the regulated firearm to commit a crime or cause harm to the purchaser, lessee, transferee, or recipient or another person; creating a certain exception; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1031 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {722019/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/29 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-44)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transfer
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {722019/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/29 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 55
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Text - Third - Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (88-44) 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Referred Rules 59
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM