Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "mother" so as to deny inclusion of a gamete donor unless the gamete donor and the child's mother agree in writing that the gamete donor will be a parent of the child, or at the time of the child's conception or birth, the gamete donor is married to the child's mother.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {672419/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {672419/1 Adopted 30
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 30
House 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 33
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 34
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 10:28 AM