Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "item" as it relates to a certain prohibition against selling or displaying a certain obscene item to a minor by including a motion picture, an image, a visual representation, a video file, a video image, or a video recording; and expanding the definition of "image" to include a two-dimensional image, a three-dimensional image, and a holographic image.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1003
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {872619/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {872619/1 Adopted 25
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 27
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 27
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM