Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Loopers Field Improvement Project
Sponsored by
Delegate Simonaire
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $50,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the County Executive and County Council of Anne Arundel County for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of Loopers Field, located in Anne Arundel County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0069
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2018 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 151). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 151 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Loopers Field Improvement Project
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m.
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM