Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Participation in the State Prescription Drug Benefit Plan
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Anderton, Bagnall, D. Barnes, Barron, Beitzel, Bhandari, Boteler, Cardin, Carey, Chang, Charkoudian, Chisholm, Clark, Crosby, D.E. Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, M. Fisher, Glenn, Grammer, Guyton, Hettleman, Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Kaiser, Kipke, Krimm, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lisanti, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Miller, Morgan, Parrott, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Rogers, Rose, Shoemaker, Stein, Sydnor, Szeliga, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, C. Watson, R. Watson, Wilson, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State to continue providing a certain prescription drug benefit plan to certain retirees by repealing the January 1, 2019, termination of a certain State prescription drug benefit plan for certain retirees, spouses, and dependent children under certain circumstances; authorizing certain retirees who participate in a certain prescription drug benefit plan with a spouse or dependent child to elect to have the spouse or dependent child covered under a certain State prescription drug benefit plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0193
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Participation in the State Prescription Drug Benefit Plan
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM