Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program - Alterations (Maryland College Access Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date of the Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program; providing that one of the purposes of the Program is to increase the number of low-income students attending and succeeding in college; altering the title of the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $200,000 for the Program; and altering the reporting dates of a certain report on the Program.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program - Alterations (Maryland College Access Act)
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
(   2015, 2018 )
Last Updated: 1/21/2021 5:56 PM
Click to return on the top page