Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
Sponsored by
Delegate Love
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to establish a beverage container deposit program on or before September 1, 2022; establishing the Advisory Commission to Develop a Beverage Container Deposit Program; requiring the Advisory Commission to develop a framework for a beverage container deposit program; requiring the Advisory Commission to report its framework and recommendations to certain members and committees of the General Assembly by December 31, 2021; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0824 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1710.1 )
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:47 PM