Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Beidle, Bromwell, Carey, Chang, Lisanti, Luedtke, Sample-Hughes, Sophocleus, Afzali, Ali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Fennell, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Krimm, Long, Mosby, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under specified circumstances for specified retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a law enforcement officer or the individual's service as fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; defining "emergency services personnel" as emergency medical technicians or paramedics; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0597
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0227 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {295569/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Clark) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {295569/1 Adopted 28
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Clark) Adopted 28
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 31
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM