Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program in Anne Arundel County; requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education, beginning in the 2018-2019 school year, in collaboration with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention, to provide awareness for all school-based personnel on human trafficking for 2 years; requiring the Department and the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide to the Board specified materials for distribution; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1273 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {535565/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564839/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {535565/1 Adopted 28
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 30
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {564839/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-440 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM