Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Facilities - Study and Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to set a date by which the Department of Natural Resources and the Department of the Environment must submit certain materials with regard to a certain proceeding for a certificate of public convenience and necessity; requiring those departments to submit the materials before the date set by the Commission unless waived by the Commission; authorizing the office of planning and zoning for certain counties or municipal corporations to submit a certain report to the Commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0090
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/26/2020
Legislative Date
10/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric Facilities - Study and Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 10/26/2020 10/26/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Electric Facilities - Study and Procedures
House 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/17/2021 1:02 PM