Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Buildings - Solar Technology - Design Development Documents
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Barve, Cardin, Cluster, Feldman, Frank, Griffith, Hammen, Ivey, Kramer, Lafferty, Luedtke, Mitchell, Mizeur, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Proctor, Reznik, S. Robinson, Stein, F. Turner, Walker, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations requiring design development documents for the construction or major renovation of school buildings to include specified information relating to the use of solar technology; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to submit a report on the use of solar technologies in specified public school construction and major renovation projects to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31 of each year; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0245
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1237 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {406489/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-4)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {406489/1 Report Adopted 31
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 33
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 32
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM