Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational Safety and Health - Good Faith Actions by Business Owners - Penalty Forgiveness
Sponsored by
Delegates McDermott, Afzali, Aumann, Boteler, Cluster, Fisher, Frank, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hogan, Hough, Jacobs, Kach, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McMillan, W. Miller, Minnick, Myers, Norman, Olszewski, Otto, Ready, Schuh, Smigiel, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Valentino-Smith, Vitale, and Weir
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Commissioner of Labor and Industry from assessing under specified circumstances a civil penalty against an employer for specified violations of the Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act, specified orders passed under that Act, or specified regulations adopted to carry out that Act; and making the Act subject to a contingency.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM