Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the period of time prior to the expiration of a tenancy that a landlord is required to notify a tenant, in writing, of the intent to terminate a tenancy upon expiration, subject to certain conditions; applying the notice provisions Statewide; and applying the Act to any residential lease executed in the State on or after October 1, 2021, and beginning October 1, 2021, to any residential lease executed before October 1, 2021 which has expired and resulted in a holdover tenancy on or after October 1, 2021.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0401
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 5:44 AM