Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Barron, Branch, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Cullison, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Hixson, Jackson, Kelly, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the penalty for the possession or use of drug paraphernalia involving the use or possession of less than 10 grams of marijuana; making the use or possession of drug paraphernalia under specified circumstances a civil offense; establishing that a person who violates specified provisions of the Act may be issued a specified citation; prohibiting a person from smoking marijuana in specified areas; providing penalties for smoking marijuana in specified areas; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate Anderson) Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {853528/2 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {603822/1 Rejected (59-78)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-48)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {438279/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {843326/1 Rejected (22-24)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {263328/1 Rejected (3-41)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate Anderson) Adopted 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {853528/2 Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {603822/1 Rejected (59-78) 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (90-48) 48
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {438279/1 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {843326/1 Rejected (22-24) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {263328/1 Rejected (3-41) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3) 61
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-8A-01, 3-8A-33, 7-302 )
(   5-601.1, 5-601.2, 5-619, 5-620 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM