Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsored by
Delegates Fennell, D. Barnes, Barron, C. Howard, Knotts, Patterson, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Tarlau, Valderrama, and Vaughn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the housing policy of the State to include providing for fair housing to all citizens regardless of reentry-into-society status; prohibiting a person from refusing to sell or rent a dwelling to any person because of reentry-into-society status; prohibiting a person from discriminating against any person in the terms, conditions, or privileges of the sale or rental of a dwelling because of reentry-into-society status; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1103, 20-701, 20-702, 20-703, 20-704, 20-705, 20-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM