Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegates Busch, Beidle, Angel, Anderton, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Jacobs, McCray, Barve, Carr, Cassilly, Clark, Folden, Frush, Gilchrist, Holmes, Jalisi, Knotts, Lafferty, R. Lewis, McMillan, Otto, Robinson, Stein, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the defined term "emergency vehicle" to include certain organ delivery vehicles; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to designate an organ delivery vehicle as an emergency vehicle only if it is registered to a federally designated organ procurement organization or a professional organ transportation organization; authorizing the driver of an emergency vehicle to exercise certain privileges while transporting human organs or medical personnel; authorizing organ delivery vehicles to be equipped with certain devices; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0475
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {210615/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {210615/1 Adopted 30
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 32
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text - Chapter - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-118, 11-142.1, 21-106, 22-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM