Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines – Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition on the sale, distribution, and disposal of certain drugs, medicines, pharmaceutical preparations, and medical preparations by means of a vending machine or similar device.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines – Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines – Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:47 PM