Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Accommodations for Disabled Voters
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, to the extent practicable, an election judge allow a disabled voter who is in a waiting line to vote to sit while waiting or move the disabled voter to the front of the waiting line.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0048
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2014 1/09/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-308.1, 1-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM