Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law that relate to joint fences for adjoining farms in St. Mary's County.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0102
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   43-1 through 43-5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM