Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Development Program Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Community Development Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; establishing the Community Development Board in the Department; establishing the Community Development Fund to provide financial assistance to community development projects and community development organizations around the State; requiring the Board to report on the activities of the Fund to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31 each year; providing for the construction of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0821
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Development Program Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {690714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {483622/1 (Delegate McDonough) Rejected (48-86)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Community Development Program Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-48)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-5)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Community Development Program Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Community Development Program Act of 2018
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {690714/1 Adopted 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 40
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Floor Amendment {483622/1 (Delegate McDonough) Rejected (48-86) 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Community Development Program Act of 2018
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-48) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-5) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Text - Chapter - Community Development Program Act of 2018
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-601 through 6-609 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM