Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $4,625,000, the proceeds to be used as grants to the Interagency Committee on School Construction and the Maryland State Department of Education for the renovation, repair, and capital improvements of qualified zone academies; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds and the further grant of funds to eligible school systems for specified purposes, subject to a requirement that the grantees document the provision of a required matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0079
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-6)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator DeGrange) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 56
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (133-6) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Referred Budget and Taxation 56
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM