Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Explorer Program - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Knotts
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Law Enforcement Explorer Program Fund to be used to make specified grants to local law enforcement agencies for law enforcement explorer programs; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; requiring the Governor, each fiscal year, to make specified appropriations to the Fund; requiring the Executive Director to establish a grant application procedure; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0745
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0855 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-601 through 4-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM