Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Maryland Judiciary)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the number of resident judges of the circuit court in Baltimore, Charles, Montgomery, and Prince George's counties and Baltimore City; increasing the number of resident judges of the District Court in District 5 (Prince George's County) and District 6 (Montgomery County); making the Act contingent on the inclusion of funding of at least $2,049,500 in the fiscal year 2016 State budget for the additional judges authorized under the Act and associated staff; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0332
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Special Order until 2/27 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {393320/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Speaker) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable 30
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Special Order until 2/27 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 30
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 33
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 38
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {393320/1 Adopted 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Motion Returned Second Reading (Speaker) Adopted 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 45
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM