Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Lierman, Dumais, and Angel
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court to order a certain defendant committed to a certain facility if the court makes a certain finding; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to admit a certain defendant to a designated facility as soon as possible, but not later than 10 business days, after the Department receives the commitment order; requiring the Department to notify the court as to the date of admittance of the defendant; authorizing a court to impose certain sanctions if the Department fails to admit a defendant within a certain time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0233
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {682516/2 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-18)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {682516/2 Adopted 30
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 30
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (113-18) 33
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 34
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-106, 3-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM