Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Gaines, Luedtke, Moon, Shetty, Turner, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain allowable union dues paid by the individual during the taxable year if the union dues would have been allowed as a deduction under the Internal Revenue Code for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2016, but before January 1, 2018; providing for the calculation of the credit; making the credit refundable; defining "allowable union dues"; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018, but before January 1, 2026; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0549
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM