Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Love
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to develop, post, and maintain on its website a list of at-risk communities in the State by January 31, 2022; requiring the Department to update the list of at-risk communities at least once every 2 years; requiring the Department to notify a municipality if any part of the municipality has been designated an at-risk community; requiring an applicant for a certain permit to prepare an environmental justice impact statement and conduct a public hearing before an application may be considered; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/25/2020
Legislative Date
9/25/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/25/2020 9/25/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-702 )
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:48 PM