Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Coffee
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting an Executive Branch agency from banning or regulating the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in any public high school in Baltimore County; and repealing a certain exception that prohibited banning or regulating the sale of coffee in a Baltimore County public high school that sold coffee on or before June 30, 2018, in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Coffee
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM