Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirements and Limits on Liability
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to $400,000 per individual claim and $800,000 per total claims the limits on liability of a local government for claims under the Local Government Tort Claims Act that arise from the same occurrence; altering the period of time from 180 days to 1 year after the injury during which a specified notice of a claim under the Local Government Tort Claims Act must be provided; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {462718/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-45)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {788978/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (28-19)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {103829/1 Rejected (21-26)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-15)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, and Parrott
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-45)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable with Amendments {462718/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (93-45) 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {788978/1 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (28-19) 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {103829/1 Rejected (21-26) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-15) 61
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, and Parrott 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman 63
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (89-45) 72
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 68
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM