Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore City Safe Streets Initiatives - Funding (The Tyrone Ray Safe Streets Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Branch, Ali, Anderson, Clippinger, Conaway, Gibson, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, R. Lewis, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Mosby, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appropriate $3,600,000 in the annual State budget for Baltimore City to be used only to provide grants to community-based organizations to implement Safe Streets Initiatives in Baltimore City; requiring that the funds be used to supplement, and not supplant, funds otherwise available; requiring that the Mayor of Baltimore City report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 31 each year on the effectiveness and status of Safe Streets Initiatives and a certain summary of the grants awarded; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Baltimore City Safe Streets Initiatives - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324366/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {163926/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-13)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Safety - Baltimore City Safe Streets Initiatives - Funding
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {324366/1 Adopted 35
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 35
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Floor Amendment {163926/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 36
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Public Safety - Baltimore City Safe Streets Initiatives - Funding (The Tyrone Ray Safe Streets Act)
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (125-13) 38
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 39
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Baltimore City Safe Streets Initiatives - Funding (The Tyrone Ray Safe Streets Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM