Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights - Minor Patients
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the patient's bill of rights required to be provided to each patient by a hospital include a statement in plain language that a parent or guardian of a minor patient has full decision-making authority regarding the health care of the minor patient unless a provision of federal or State law allows the minor patient to consent to medical treatment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights - Minor Patients
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights - Minor Patients
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page