Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Recovery Efforts Following Residential Fires
Sponsored by
Delegates Stukes, Braveboy, Conaway, DeBoy, Glenn, Mitchell, B. Robinson, Walker, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Recovery Efforts Following Residential Fires; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and report on specified issues; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before a specified date; terminating the Act at the end of May 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM