Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the county boards of education receive a specified grant to reflect regional differences in the cost of education that are due to factors outside of the control of the local jurisdiction; and repealing a provision that allowed for the reduction of a grant under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2014 1/09/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM