Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional Services, Law Enforcement, or Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly and Cassilly
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $15,000 to $30,000 the maximum amount of a subtraction modification under the State income tax of certain individuals for retirement income attributable to employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional Services, Law Enforcement, or Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Services Personnel
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM