Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Firearms and Global Positioning Satellite (GPS) Devices
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Firearms and Global Positioning Satellite (GPS) Devices; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the feasibility, utility, benefits, and costs of using GPS technology to track and monitor firearms sold and possessed in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2014 1/09/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM