Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers' Pension System - Option Election
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis (By Request)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing certain retirees of the Teachers' Pension System to elect a change in an optional form of allowance; specifying the manner in which an election to change a certain optional form of allowance shall be made; specifying the manner in which a retiree's allowance shall be calculated and paid under a change to an optional form of allowance made in accordance with the Act; and providing for the termination of the Act on June 30, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Teachers' Pension System - Option Election
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Teachers' Pension System - Option Election
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/10/2020 10:04 AM