Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, Otto, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Vogt, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that specified motor fuel tax rates be adjusted in future years based on growth in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0174 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page