Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Television Service Providers - Missed Appointments
Sponsored by
Delegates Branch, Davis, Glenn, B. Robinson, Tarrant, and Vaughn
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified television service providers to notify a subscriber of the right to receive an installation or repair service within a 3-hour period if the subscriber's presence is required; requiring a television service provider and a subscriber to agree on the time at which the 3-hour period begins; establishing specified penalties if a television service provider does not begin an installation or repair service within the specified 3-hour period; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0220
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1324 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM