Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland School Assessment - Request for Waiver
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Afzali, Barkley, Cullison, Elliott, Fraser-Hidalgo, Kach, A. Kelly, Krebs, Ready, S. Robinson, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to request a specified waiver from the U.S. Department of Education within a specified period of time; prohibiting the Department from administering the Maryland School Assessment in the spring of 2014 under specified circumstances; and requiring the Department to administer the Maryland School Assessment under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0165
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2014 1/09/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2014 3/05/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM