Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Licensure Requirements for Pharmacists - Proof of Proficiency in English
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Angel, Hammen, Hill, Kelly, McMillan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, K. Young, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, for applicants for a license to practice pharmacy, graduation from a recognized English-speaking professional school accredited by the Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education is acceptable proof of proficiency in the oral communication of the English language.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0469
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {116886/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-15)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {116886/1 Report Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (124-15) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM