Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - School Public Safety Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Ali, Anderson, Branch, Clippinger, Conaway, Gibson, Hayes, Haynes, R. Lewis, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Mosby, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to provide, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling located in Baltimore City that is owned by a public safety officer employed by the Baltimore City Public School System; and applying the Act to taxable years after June 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0394
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - School Public Safety Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - School Public Safety Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - School Public Safety Officers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - School Public Safety Officers
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - School Public Safety Officers
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 40
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 41
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - School Public Safety Officers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM