Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Drivers’ Education Schools – Age of Instruction Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of a vehicle that is older than 10 model years for instruction in a drivers' school.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2018
Legislative Date
1/16/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Drivers’ Education Schools – Age of Instruction Vehicles
House 1/16/2018 1/16/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-708 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM